Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF AVENING SCHOOL
Charity number: 1055040
Charity reporting is overdue by 42 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 42 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 42 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 October 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 September 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 August 2020 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window