Financial history PEGASUS THEATRE TRUST

Charity number: 1055305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £798.21k £688.76k £665.63k £623.27k £615.67k
Total expenditure £828.03k £828.89k £822.53k £864.94k £684.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £547.53k £413.86k £352.47k £354.79k £425.91k
Income - Donations and legacies £647.66k £518.55k £480.33k £452.86k £535.90k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £149.35k £169.61k £185.20k £170.18k £79.78k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.20k £603 £100 £236 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £793.20k £785.64k £780.98k £820.38k £643.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds £34.83k £43.25k £41.55k £44.56k £41.34k
Expenditure - Governance £4.25k £0 £0 £4.72k £7.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0