Financial history AMBASSADORS FOOTBALL LIMITED

Charity number: 1055422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £370.96k £354.82k £329.02k £292.42k £282.74k
Total expenditure £365.46k £353.30k £331.66k £259.43k £268.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £5.00k £30.44k