T P RILEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1055640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £621.27k £627.13k £713.57k £873.45k £788.59k
Total expenditure £571.18k £639.58k £627.28k £731.00k £755.61k
Income from government contracts £267.44k £248.22k £280.59k £191.42k £156.77k
Income from government grants £3.45k £3.53k £3.00k £1.27k £25.12k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £23.16k £29.47k £41.91k £49.59k £76.02k
Income - Charitable activities £598.01k £597.55k £671.58k £823.75k £712.38k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £98 £108 £86 £122 £188
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £570.86k £636.60k £627.28k £719.46k £745.08k
Expenditure - Raising funds £315 £2.97k £0 £11.54k £10.53k
Expenditure - Governance £168.50k £212.59k £166.87k £188.41k £207.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0