SHREWTON PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1055885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £53.56k £39.08k £58.39k £44.10k £60.89k
Total expenditure £52.59k £40.42k £52.21k £49.99k £51.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.00k