Financial history WOODFORD HALSE FRIENDS OF THE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1055929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £19.38k £7.88k £7.50k £8.15k £6.52k
Total expenditure £10.71k £7.93k £3.88k £5.04k £1.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A