SOUTH TEES HOSPITALS CHARITY AND ASSOCIATED FUNDS

Charity number: 1056061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.82m £2.69m £1.67m £1.59m £1.44m
Total expenditure £2.46m £3.82m £1.96m £1.58m £1.58m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.14m £2.11m £1.42m £1.28m £995.48k
Income - Other trading activities £46.00k £27.00k £29.80k £54.78k £0
Income - Charitable activities £482.00k £389.00k £24.51k £41.60k £199.74k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £154.00k £169.00k £195.50k £217.84k £240.27k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £392.00k £210.00k £0 £194.39k £205.55k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.25m £3.58m £1.72m £1.32m £1.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £206.00k £237.00k £238.41k £258.79k £263.15k
Expenditure - Governance £6.00k £4.80k £0 £3.00k £9.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £25.00k £28.00k £0 £26.06k £33.73k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0