Financial history WHITWELL NEW FELLOWSHIP HALL

Charity number: 1056067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.79k £11.74k £12.03k £10.92k £557
Total expenditure £11.73k £11.55k £14.04k £10.26k £6.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A