THE ST PETER AND ST JAMES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1056114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/09/1983 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/1996 AS AMENDED ON 21/07/2003 AS AMENDED ON 25/07/2004 AS AMENDED ON 05/12/2011 AS AMENDED ON 04 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE PATIENTS OF THE ST PETER AND ST JAMES HOSPICE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPICE TO WHOM THE CHARITY IS ULTIMATELY RESPONSIBLE.
Area of benefit
THE HOSPICE OF ST PETER AND ST JAMES
Registration history
  • 20 January 1984 : Standard registration