INNER TEMPLE BENEFACTORS SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity number: 1056609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £153.02k £181.23k £128.52k £131.55k £66.48k
Total expenditure £179.07k £172.05k £211.63k £207.93k £130.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A