SOMALI BRAVANESE WELFARE ASSOCIATION IN BARNET

Charity number: 1056856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £23.41k £5.24k £3.17k £14.46k £75.09k
Total expenditure £23.19k £7.68k £3.48k £8.90k £31.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.70k N/A N/A N/A N/A