Trustees HERSDEN UNDER FIVES PROJECT
Charity number: 1057036
Charity reporting is up to date (106 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Stanger | Chair | 03 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kristine Likaj | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Rowberry | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Bourton | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW KITE | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.