Trustees North Staffordshire Combined Healthcare NHS Trust
Charity number: 1057104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Rogers | Chair | 01 August 2014 |
|
|||||
Paul Darren Draycott | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Michelle Mellor | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Richards | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Eric Gardiner | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Jones | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Gordon Laing | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Russell Mark Andrews | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Kathleen Dawson | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Walley | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK SULLIVAN | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr OLUBUKOLA ADEYEMO | Trustee | 27 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY GADSBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE COMBINED HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.