Trustees SHEFFIELD DISABLED FISHING GROUP
Charity number: 1057148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Horsfield | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Roberts | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEITH LEVY | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Harold Barratt | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Barry Wild | Trustee | 19 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.