UK ALBANIAN MUSLIM COMMUNITY & CULTURAL CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1057193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £55.71k £60.96k £141.92k £263.82k £132.15k
Total expenditure £49.45k £59.89k £102.99k £131.10k £156.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £31.94k