Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. MARGARET

Charity number: 1057228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.91k £4.06k £7.49k £688 £1.06k
Total expenditure £5.80k £1.03k £3.54k £231 £122
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A