HERRING HOUSE TRUST (GREAT YARMOUTH)

Charity number: 1057387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £877.11k £882.68k £858.62k £773.95k £882.36k
Total expenditure £795.37k £792.60k £726.20k £761.29k £820.48k
Income from government contracts £401.57k £0 £345.32k £227.37k £226.85k
Income from government grants £8.57k £393.97k N/A N/A £135.03k
Income - Donations and legacies £474.15k £220 £0 £1.58k £4.12k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £402.54k £882.45k £858.61k £772.32k £878.09k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5 £4 £3 £51 £146
Income - Other £413 £12 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £795.37k £797.11k £726.20k £761.29k £820.48k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.42k £4.51k £0 £5.02k £5.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0