FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY YELDEN

Charity number: 1057623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.82k £3.05k £3.14k £3.52k £3.51k
Total expenditure £5.23k £1.74k £2.49k £1.07k £9.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A