Governing document SNAITH AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY LEISURE AND SPORTS ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 AUGUST 1994 AS AMENDED 11 JUNE 1996 as amended on 19 Feb 2019 as amended on 19 Feb 2019 as amended on 10 Apr 2020 as amended on 18 May 2020 as amended on 24 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF SNAITH AND DISTRICTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY AND SPORTS HALL
Area of benefit
SNAITH AND DISTRICTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.