Trustees YOUNG DEVON
Charity number: 1057949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vincent Flower | Chair | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Brown | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Laws | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Taylor Simmonds | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Chapple | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Merilion | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Vincent Coward | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Bernadette Hannaford | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Warren-Brown | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Roscoe Hastings | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.