Trustees THE SOUTHWARK CATHEDRAL EDUCATION TRUST
Charity number: 1058369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev WENDY SHERIDAN ROBINS | Chair | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Margaret Cordner | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Chapman | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Quintrell | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amir Eden | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|||||
LINDA HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Professor Peter Toyne | Trustee | 17 August 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.