Financial history ST JOHNS AND HIGHWOODS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 1058410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £241.90k £256.25k £355.98k £261.30k £281.60k
Total expenditure £236.89k £238.27k £378.01k £228.22k £277.98k
Income from government contracts £100.17k £108.09k £149.26k £117.92k £130.49k
Income from government grants N/A £1.10k £38.76k £59.31k £10.58k