Financial history THE VAULKHARD DOUGLAS - HOME MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1058423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £4.41k £4.48k £4.22k £4.07k £8.67k
Total expenditure £0 £6.45k £8.70k £30.50k £7.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A