ISLAMIC CENTRE OF ENGLAND LIMITED

Charity number: 1058998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £906.83k £719.45k £777.30k £583.64k £625.47k
Total expenditure £888.31k £894.20k £802.79k £687.06k £563.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £784.90k £600.53k £673.78k £420.70k £484.97k
Income - Other trading activities £121.90k £118.92k £103.49k £6.79k £6.20k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £24.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £26 £1 £37 £55 £7
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £156.10k £109.48k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £353.71k £403.25k £313.72k £686.58k £563.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds £534.59k £490.95k £489.07k £485 £112
Expenditure - Governance £18.05k £16.43k £0 £0 £25.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0