Accounts and annual returns ST MICHAEL'S ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL AND HOME

Charity number: 1059017
Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 March 2022 248 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required