BISHOP CREIGHTON HOUSE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 1059084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £765.18k £850.04k £867.23k £802.79k £677.41k
Total expenditure £761.61k £816.68k £880.95k £845.07k £779.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £13.86k N/A £42.00k N/A
Income from government grants £376.37k £431.63k £473.73k £42.00k £339.98k
Income - Donations and legacies £9.15k £21.82k £18.60k £19.85k £8.88k
Income - Other trading activities £43.52k £46.36k £41.42k £43.18k £42.88k
Income - Charitable activities £639.12k £714.96k £737.16k £673.10k £557.67k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £64.60k £63.46k £58.28k £64.08k £60.78k
Income - Other £8.79k £3.44k £11.78k £2.59k £7.21k
Income - Legacies £150 £2.00k £0 £6.00k £880
Expenditure - Charitable activities £668.60k £751.66k £774.73k £768.87k £661.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds £93.01k £65.02k £106.22k £76.20k £117.72k
Expenditure - Governance £19.09k £23.12k £25.82k £38.45k £33.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £18.01k £11.62k £24.20k £11.14k £20.07k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0