Financial history MIDDLESBROUGH FOOTBALL CLUB FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1059418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.87m £1.93m £2.39m £2.08m £2.10m
Total expenditure £1.75m £1.81m £1.85m £1.69m £1.83m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £63.20k
Income from government grants £175.00k £175.00k £120.00k N/A £24.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £268.10k £224.09k £722.11k £808.66k £735.60k
Income - Other trading activities £122.57k £150.84k £184.17k £105.56k £59.20k
Income - Charitable activities £1.48m £1.56m £1.49m £1.17m £1.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.66m £1.75m £1.76m £1.63m £1.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £84.33k £56.61k £90.74k £55.58k £76.65k
Expenditure - Governance £30.12k £45.92k £57.41k £28.11k £19.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0