Governing document CARERS TRUST TYNE & WEAR
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 SEP 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 JUL 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 SEP 1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04 NOV 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 JUL 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 APR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 NOV 2014 as amended on 23 Apr 2021 as amended on 30 Mar 2021 as amended on 28 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS, AND CHILDREN AND ADULTS WHO HAVE CARE NEEDS, AS A RESULT OF DISABILITY, ILLNESS OR AGE BY OFFERING A RESPITE SERVICE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY-BASED SUPPORT WORKERS
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF GATESHEAD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.