MISS ESPERANCE LOUISE MARIE COLEMAN'S WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1059954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.70k £266 £11 £2.07k £2.15k
Total expenditure £60.99k £1.05k £1.05k £1.05k £1.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A