Financial history COLLINGHAM YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1060024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.83k £3.86k £4.96k £4.03k £11.75k
Total expenditure £5.09k £3.86k £4.75k £4.90k £6.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k