Financial history Derbyshire Community Transport Ltd

Charity number: 1060048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.51m £1.42m £1.54m £1.84m £965.47k
Total expenditure £1.60m £1.54m £1.79m £2.13m £918.70k
Income from government contracts £663.22k £845.05k £1.36m £1.53m £671.84k
Income from government grants £289.89k £190.89k £15.10k £5.61k £249.11k
Income - Donations and legacies £359.17k £228.51k £15.10k £5.68k £249.11k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.15m £1.19m £1.53m £1.82m £706.58k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £52 £8 £25 £50 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £14.94k £9.78k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.60m £1.54m £1.79m £2.13m £918.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £56.45k £0 £41.16k £4.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0