FRIENDS OF CHELSEA CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL

Charity number: 1060218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £31.90k £55.04k £46.36k £52.68k £51.93k
Total expenditure £96.09k £61.32k £70.98k £91.17k £31.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A