Accounts and annual returns MANSTON BABY AND TODDLER GROUP
Charity number: 1060299
Charity reporting is overdue by 1771 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 310 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 310 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 675 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 675 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1040 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1040 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1405 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1405 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1771 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1771 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window