OAKLANDS PFA

Charity number: 1060561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £7.03k £10.22k £8.25k £800 £1.96k
Total expenditure £9.56k £15.82k £20.37k £12.38k £7.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A