PROSPECTS FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES

Charity number: 1060571
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £11.70m £9.82m £8.26m £535.92k £424.19k
Total expenditure £12.62m £11.04m £10.44m £535.92k £424.19k
Income from government contracts £10.19m £9.34m £7.88m N/A £424.19k
Income from government grants £310.79k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £967.50k £408.04k £344.84k £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £15.25k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £10.50m £9.37m £7.88m £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £12.04k £5.77k £72 £0 N/A
Income - Other £203.52k £41.14k £43.98k £535.92k N/A
Income - Legacies £622.14k £112.61k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.38m £10.97m £10.38m £535.92k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £64.65k £61.16k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £42.06k £31.64k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £87.35k £3.91k £0 £0 N/A