Financial history THE SHOWERING FUND

Charity number: 200017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £29.68k £29.58k £30.67k £28.31k £21.08k
Total expenditure £10.89k £17.20k £28.55k £10.41k £1.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A