Trustees RICHMOND PARISH LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 200069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jerome Jude Misso Chair 19 October 2018
None on record
Dr Mary Elizabeth Frederica Henes Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Sarah Louise Lester Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
david herring Trustee 29 June 2022
BURMA FORCES WELFARE ASSOCIATION
Overdue by 168 days
Stephen Speak Trustee 01 July 2021
THE LONDON FORUM OF AMENITY AND CIVIC SOCIETIES
Received: On time
Duncan Richford Trustee 16 November 2020
SPEAR HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Claire O'Donnell Trustee 16 November 2020
RICHMOND AND HILLCROFT ADULT AND COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Received: 1 day late
Ruth Scott Trustee 16 November 2020
None on record
CLLR RICHARD PYNE Trustee 01 May 2019
RICHMOND CHARITIES
Received: On time
RICHMOND PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE RICHMOND AID IN SICKNESS FUND
Received: On time
THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY
Received: On time
Chris Phillips Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
CAROL FLETCHER Trustee 19 October 2018
None on record
Dr JOANNA MARGARET NAKIELNY Trustee 19 October 2018
None on record
Owen Carew-Jones Trustee 06 October 2015
None on record