Accounts and annual returns COMPTON UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 200150
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 109 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 109 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 23 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 08 March 2022 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 04 April 2021 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 22 January 2020 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required