Financial history CHOBHAM POOR ALLOTMENTS

Charity number: 200154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £54.50k £55.87k £56.48k £52.46k £51.23k
Total expenditure £38.84k £50.49k £52.61k £50.84k £69.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A