RICHARD HARTWELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 200303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £58 £0 £58 £106 £72
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £500 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A