Financial history SISTERS OF MERCY, GRAVESEND, KENT

Charity number: 200376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £578.50k £564.84k £558.25k £534.65k £438.05k
Total expenditure £385.47k £372.23k £347.01k £362.79k £436.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.87k £15.81k £2.56k £2.99k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £301.37k £266.11k £258.00k £254.58k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £275.27k £282.93k £297.69k £277.08k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £351.33k £350.35k £345.00k £345.37k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £34.14k £21.89k £2.01k £17.42k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.94k £3.19k £8.73k £19.48k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £34.14k £21.89k £2.01k £17.42k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A