Financial history WONERSH MEMORIAL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 200401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.42k £6.42k £7.70k £20.93k £11.17k
Total expenditure £13.44k £6.72k £7.22k £27.29k £9.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k