Governing document FUEL DISTRIBUTION CHARITY OR ALLOTMENTS FOR FUEL
Charity number: 200491
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEMES OF THE 10TH DECEMBER 1901 AND 11TH AUGUST 1905. SCHEME DATED 23RD DECEMBER 1964 AS VARIED 6TH JULY 1964 AND 12TH JUNE 1973.
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF FUEL FORTHE POOR.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CATERHAM AND WARLINGHAM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.