THE SAINTS AND SINNERS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 200536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £100.02k £120.06k £115.56k £106.45k £76.61k
Total expenditure £90.38k £110.89k £102.25k £117.60k £126.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A