Financial history COTTENHAM CHARITIES

Charity number: 200586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £39.95k £38.78k £40.28k £42.66k £42.76k
Total expenditure £39.52k £29.23k £31.39k £30.63k £43.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £2.50k