WYCHBOLD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 201029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.60k £9.45k £9.64k £15.89k £6.50k
Total expenditure £10.07k £8.88k £4.60k £13.22k £6.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A