Financial history FAWSETT CHARITY

Charity number: 201150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.09k £2.05k £2.88k £4.28k £6.73k
Total expenditure £2.19k £2.29k £2.11k £1.96k £2.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A