Financial history JOHN BAKER

Charity number: 201282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £20.66k £20.18k £21.06k £21.03k £20.98k
Total expenditure £30.78k £23.21k £10.84k £17.91k £20.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A