Accounts and annual returns BROADWAS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 201450
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required