Financial history THE SLOUGH AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY FUND

Charity number: 201598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £3.85k £4.80k £3.91k £3.49k £3.73k
Total expenditure £845 £1.28k £900 £600 £10.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A